judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEJAS AVCO INC. AND GREGORY ABARR v. THE HONORABLE JEANNE MEURER JUDGE

Case: 94-0270
94-0270
03/17/1994
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
TEJAS AVCO INC. AND GREGORY ABARR
THE HONORABLE JEANNE MEURER JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/21/1994Case StoredM/L/F Withdrawn
06/02/1994Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling granted
06/02/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedWithdrawn
05/24/1994Motion to Withdraw Filed"Relators motion to withdraw M/L/F Pet Mand
05/20/1994Letter FiledLetter from attorney general with attached copies of letters from Relators att state will not file a reply due to a motion to withdraw M/L/F to be filed
05/19/1994Letter FiledRELATOR'S INTEND TO FILE MO/WITHDRAW M/L/F CALL MADE TO COURT
04/11/1994Reply to Response to Motionreply to m/e/t to file reply
03/31/1994Letter Filedno opposition to m/e/t to reply
03/25/1994MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedreply due 04-08-94
03/21/1994Addendum to brief receivedto page 3 of petition
03/17/1994Exhibits receivedA-I attached to Petition
03/17/1994Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusNOTE PAGE 2 OF M/L/F **DID NOT GO TO COA
03/17/1994Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/21/1994Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASRespondentMs. Suzanne Clayton
GRIFFITH, JR., JAMIERelatorMr. Rex H. White Jr.
THE CITY OF ARCOLARespondentMr. A. Rick Hightower
TEJAS AVCO, INC.RelatorMr. Elbert Hooper
ABARR, GREGORYRelatorMr. Rex H. White Jr.
TEXAS WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARDRespondentMr. Brian E. Berwick
Mr. Dan Morales
AM-TEXRespondentMr. A. Rick Hightower
DELEON, MAYOR LINDARespondentMr. A. Rick Hightower
ARCOLA TEXASRespondentMr. A. Rick Hightower
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
201st District Court
Travis
Honorable W. Jeanne Meurer
93-08498