judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SEGAL VS. SEGAL

Case Information: 34687
Short Caption:SEGAL VS. SEGALCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33030 , 37731
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A344597Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dickerson Dickerson Consul & Pocker--check no. 03449.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07732
08/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/13/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned, unfiled, the original and three copies of the document entitled, "Amended Notice of Appeal, or Alternatively Notice of Appeal, " received in this court on September 13, 1999.
10/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 99-10127
10/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Firm Change of Address. 99-10374
10/29/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
02/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are instructed to inform the Settlement Judge of the status of their settlement negotiations within 45 days of the date of this report. 00-02180
05/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Brief and Appendix and to Consolidate Appeals (nos. 33030/34687). 00-08946
08/21/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Conference Judge recommends this appeal (Case No. 34687) be removed from the settlement conference program and that it be consolidated with Case No. 33030. 00-14650
10/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge, the appeal in Docket No. 34687 is removed from the settlement conference program. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a docketing statement in Docket No. 34687. The time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and the briefing schedule in docket No. 34687 shall remain suspended. We defer ruling on respondent's motion to consolidate the above-entitled appeals, pending completion of our jurisdictional review in Docket No. 34687 and further order of this court. We grant respondent's May 26, 2000 motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief and appendix in Docket No. 33030. The clerk of this court shall file the respondent's answering brief and appendix received on June 15, 2000 in Docket No. 33030. We grant appellant's October 18, 2000 motion. Appellant shall file and serve the reply brief in Docket No. 33030 within 7 days from the date of this order. fn1[In light of this order we disapprove the parties' July 18, 2000, stipulation and we deny appellant's August 21, 2000, motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief in Docket No. 33030.] (Docketing statement mailed to counsl for appellant in Docket No. 34687.) Nos. 33030, 34687-cases are not consolidated. 00-18550
11/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-20536
11/29/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on November 22, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-20873
11/29/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-20537
02/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. We defer ruling on respondent's motion to consolidate this appeal with Docket No. 33030 pending receipt and consideration of apellant's response to this order. 01-02521
02/26/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 01-03598
03/02/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's response to the order to show cause entered on February 7, 2001, shall be filed and served on or before April 9, 2001. 01-03838
04/11/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 01-06203
04/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including April 17, 2001, to file a response to this court's February 7, 2001, order to show cause. 01-06470
04/19/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-06692
05/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. In response to our order to show cause, appellant concedes that the orders are not appealable. fn2[We note that on April 19, 1999, appellant filed a petiton for relief in this court challenging the contempt orders (Docket No. 37731).] "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's May 26, 2000 motion to consolidate this appeal with the pending appeal in Docket No. 33030.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-07588
06/04/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08026
06/04/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 6, 2001. 01-08026