judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: MARIA ALVAREZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-139)
Case Number:06-139Case Docketed On:06/16/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: MARIA ALVAREZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: MARIA ALVAREZ, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Petitioner)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMaria AlvarezDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 126
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/16/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/16/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2006Brief - Appellant (Runner presented designation of record for filing. Told him it needs to be a district court pleading and is filed thereBriefAppellantFinal
09/19/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
09/26/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/09/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/06/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Kite writing for the court. Justice Golden files a dissenting opinion in which Chief Justice Voigt joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/13/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/28/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/28/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/30/07 by E. Smith.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal