judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: TRISTAN TYLER

Case Information: 10-BG-0727
Short Caption:IN RE: TRISTAN TYLERClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN74-10Filed Date:06/17/2010

Opening Event Date:06/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentTristan Tyler NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/17/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of the criminal disposition concerning respondent, who is an active member of the Bar of the District of Columbia. Respondent pled guilty to driving while intoxicated in the Municipal Courts, for Bass River, Washington Township, New Jersey.
07/12/2010ORDER On consideration of the certified copy of respondent's guilty plea in the Municipal Courts, for Bass River, Washington Township, New Jersey, to driving while intoxicated, it is hereby ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (e), that Bar Counsel shall investigate the matter and proceed as appropriate under D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 8, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
12/08/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that this matter has been resolved without the necessity of further court action.
12/13/2010DISMISSED On consideration of the letter from the Office of Bar Counsel dated December 8, 2010, advising the court that Bar Counsel has disposed of this matter pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 6 (a)(3), it is ORDERED that this matter is hereby closed. (ETW)