Case: A-10762
A-10762
04/26/1965
Application for Writ of Error
OTTO GOEDECKE, INC.
T. H. HENDERSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/09/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
05/24/1965 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
05/17/1965 | Supplement to Petition filed | Respondent | | |
05/11/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/26/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
04/26/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/09/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/24/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/17/1965 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
05/11/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/26/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
04/26/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
04/26/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
T. H. Henderson | Respondent | |
Otto Goedecke, Inc. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information