Case: A-10719
A-10719
04/02/1965
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN B. COFFEE, ET AL.
WILLIAM MARSH RICE UNIVERSITY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/11/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
10/26/1965 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
10/04/1965 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
05/20/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/15/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/02/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1971 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
05/25/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/11/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/27/1966 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
04/27/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/26/1965 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
10/04/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
05/20/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/15/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/02/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
04/02/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John B. Coffee, et al. | Petitioner | |
William Marsh Rice University, et al. | Respondent | |
Waggoner Carr, Attorney General of Texas | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information