Case: A-10728
A-10728
04/08/1965
Application for Writ of Error
MARY ISBELL
ANNIE ISBELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/16/1965 | Errata Filed | Respondent | | |
10/14/1965 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/22/1965 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
04/08/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/03/1965 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/16/1965 | Errata Filed | | ||
10/14/1965 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
06/16/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/22/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/08/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/08/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Annie Isbell | Respondent | |
Mary Isbell | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information