Case: A-10738
A-10738
04/15/1965
Application for Writ of Error
M. D. PARSON
LOUISE PARSON, TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/21/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
04/26/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/26/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/15/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/20/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/08/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/21/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
04/26/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/26/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/15/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
04/15/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Employers Insurance Association | Respondent | |
Louise Parson | Respondent | |
M. D. Parson | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information