Case: A-10757
A-10757
04/22/1965
Application for Writ of Error
MARGIE REA MARTIN, ET VIR
LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/24/1965 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
05/12/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/22/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/24/1965 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
05/12/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/06/1965 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | | ||
04/22/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
04/22/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Corporation | Respondent | |
Margie Rea Martin, et vir | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information