Case: 05-99-01249-CR
05-99-01249-CR
07/28/1999
All Misdemeanors
Hastings, Mary Katherine
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/19/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/19/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/04/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/20/2000 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
11/15/2000 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
11/14/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
11/13/2000 | Record Shipped | | |
10/30/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
09/22/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/22/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
09/22/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/21/2000 | Submission | | |
09/21/2000 | Submitted | | |
08/25/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
08/18/2000 | Brief Due | | |
08/15/2000 | Submission | | |
07/19/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/19/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
07/18/2000 | Brief Received | | |
07/18/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/03/2000 | Notice To Appellant that Brief is late | | |
03/22/2000 | Brief Due | | |
03/06/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/02/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/20/2000 | Notice To Appellant that Brief is late | | |
10/27/1999 | Brief Due | | |
09/27/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
09/27/1999 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
09/18/1999 | Record due | | |
09/16/1999 | Defective reporter's record | | |
09/16/1999 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
09/16/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/12/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
07/29/1999 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
07/28/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/28/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/20/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
07/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/19/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John Roach, Sr. |
Mary Katherine Hastings | Criminal - Appellant | John D. Nation |
Marigay Black | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Marigay Black |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Collin
Honorable Jerry C. Lewis
002-82568-98
10 Days & $375 Fine