Case: A-10749
A-10749
04/19/1965
Application for Writ of Error
RAYMOND REMIGIO GARZA, ET AL.
ABELINO ALVIAR, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/18/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/18/1965 | Supplement to Response | Petitioner | | |
05/20/1965 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
05/13/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
05/05/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/19/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/18/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/03/1965 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/18/1965 | Supplement to Response | | ||
05/26/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/20/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
05/13/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
05/05/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/19/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
04/19/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Abelino Alviar, et al. | Respondent | |
Raymond Remigio Garza, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information