Case: 05-98-00536-CV
05-98-00536-CV
04/02/1998
Miscellaneous civil
Tenery Trust and Barry Alan Johnson
Bank of New York
No
11th Court of Appeals
04/17/1998
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/04/1998 | Record due | | |
04/21/1998 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
04/17/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/17/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/02/1998 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
04/02/1998 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
04/02/1998 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
04/02/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/02/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/02/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/23/1998 | Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed | | |
02/04/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/06/1997 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bank Of New York | Appellee | G. Thomas Bastian |
District Clerk | District Clerk | District Clerk |
Court Reporter | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 191st Ditrict Court |
Judge | Judge - Trial Court | Dallas District Judge, 191st District Court |
Tenery Trust And Barry Johnson | Appellant | Barry Alan Johnson |
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable David Cave
97-09783