Case: 11-95-00175-CR
11-95-00175-CR
05/23/1995
Assault & battery
Williams, Michael Dwayne
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
05/23/1995
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/21/2010 | Motion to recall mandate disposed | Overruled | |
01/19/2010 | Motion to recall mandate filed | | |
09/12/2008 | Letter filed | | |
07/24/2002 | Letter filed from . . . | Ct App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd | |
07/15/2002 | Case returned from higher court | | |
07/10/2002 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
06/10/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case | | |
05/30/2002 | Miscellaneous motion disposed | Overruled | |
05/28/2002 | Miscellaneous motion filed | | |
04/25/2002 | Miscellaneous motion disposed | Overruled | |
04/19/2002 | Miscellaneous motion filed | | |
02/07/2002 | Miscellaneous motion disposed | Overruled | |
01/22/2002 | Miscellaneous motion filed | | |
01/17/2002 | Miscellaneous motion disposed | Overruled | |
01/14/2002 | Miscellaneous motion filed | | |
01/10/2002 | Miscellaneous motion disposed | Overruled | |
01/02/2002 | Miscellaneous motion filed | | |
02/25/1999 | Record checked in | | |
10/23/1998 | Record checked out | | |
04/14/1997 | Mandate issued | | |
03/12/1997 | Case returned from higher court | | |
02/05/1997 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposed | Refused | |
12/31/1996 | Yearly opinion book | | |
10/29/1996 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
10/14/1996 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case | | |
09/12/1996 | Mot. - For rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
08/29/1996 | Mot. - For rehearing filed | | |
08/01/1996 | Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/29/1996 | Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH | | |
07/11/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/13/1996 | Submitted | | |
06/13/1996 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
05/14/1996 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
04/15/1996 | Brief filed | | |
04/15/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/14/1996 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/08/1996 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
11/22/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/20/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
10/23/1995 | Brief filed | | |
08/24/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/21/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
07/20/1995 | Mot. - Ext. time to file SF disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/20/1995 | SF filed | | |
07/19/1995 | SF received | | |
07/10/1995 | Mot. - Ext. time to file SF | | |
06/30/1995 | Inquiring on status, etc. of case | | |
06/30/1995 | TR filed | | |
05/23/1995 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
05/23/1995 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/14/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Bill Hill |
Williams, Michael Dwayne | Criminal - Appellant | Michael Dwayne Williams Marty Lee Rogers |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable John C. Creuzot, Judge
F94-03570-TK
20 years, $1000 fine