Case: PD-0002-97
PD-0002-97
01/02/1997
PDR Case Type
BRYANT, GREGORY DWAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/17/2012 | COPY REQUEST | | |
03/22/2006 | STATUS REQUEST PDR | Refused | |
02/14/1997 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
01/29/1997 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
01/29/1997 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
01/02/1997 | PDR FILED | | |
01/02/1997 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/14/1997 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BRYANT, GREGORY DWAYNE | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | GREGORY DWAYNE BRYANT Gary Michael Polland |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-95-00430-CR
AFF 10-10-96
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable SAM ROBERTSON
680609