judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00203-CR
07-89-00203-CR
06/09/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Rey, Senaido, Jr. aka Sam Rey, Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1990Mandate Issued
04/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Brief Filed
12/22/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/22/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/29/1989Brief Filed
10/24/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
09/28/1989Do not use
09/01/1989Supplemental Record FiledGRANT
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
08/30/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/18/1989Motion to Amend Record Filed
07/20/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/19/1989Do not use
07/19/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
251st District Court
Potter
Honorable Patrick A. Pirtle
27,600-C
35 years TDC 35,000.00