Case: 07-89-00202-CV
07-89-00202-CV
06/09/1989
Miscellaneous civil
High Plains Wire Line Services, Inc.
Hysell Wire Line Serivce, et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/19/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/04/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed/Reversed & Rendered | |
01/04/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed/Reversed & Rendered | |
10/03/1990 | Submitted | | |
10/03/1990 | Submission | | |
09/12/1990 | Submission | | |
09/19/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
09/19/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/29/1989 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
08/15/1989 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/25/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
07/19/1989 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
07/07/1989 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/09/1989 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
06/09/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/19/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hysell Wire Line Serivce, Et A | Appellee | Tark Cook |
High Plains Wire Line Services | Appellant | William L. Rivers |
Trial Court Information
84th District Court
Ochiltree
Honorable Juan E. Blackburn
7857