judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00535-CR
14-89-00535-CR
06/09/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Blair, Edna Marie AKA Jones, Letha
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/29/1991Case stored
10/23/1991Mandate Issued
10/23/1991Mandate Issued
10/08/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
09/11/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
06/04/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/27/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/10/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
04/25/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/25/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/13/1991Submitted
03/13/1991Submission
03/13/1991Submitted
02/15/1991Submission
01/29/1991Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/29/1991Case ready to be set
01/29/1991Case ready to be set
01/24/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/18/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/10/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/28/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/06/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/29/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/01/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/29/1990Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
10/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/04/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/13/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/07/1990No description available.
08/02/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/31/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/24/1990No description available.
06/21/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/13/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/07/1990No description available.
05/07/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
02/01/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/24/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/17/1990No description available.
10/19/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/12/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/11/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/04/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/04/1989Transcript FILED
07/05/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/06/1989Date of Sentence
06/06/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. J. R. Seeman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM HATTEN
498,330
20 years TDC/$10,000 fine