judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8741
C-8741
06/09/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ENSTAR PETROLEUM COMPANY A DIVISION OF ENSTAR CORPORATION
THE HONORABLE FERNANDO G. MANCIAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/29/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentMURRY'S REPLY INCORPORATED WITH PET FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/03/1989Case StoredNO REEHARING FILED
07/12/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledCROSS-MOTION BEHALF OF MANCIAS
07/12/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledW/CROSS-MOTION FOR LEAVE OVERRULED
06/29/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusON BEHALF OF MANCIAS ET AL.
06/29/1989Petition for writ receivedON BEHALF OF MANCIAS ET AL.
06/29/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusMURRY'S REPLY INCORPORATED WITH PET FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
06/22/1989Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedREPLY JUNE 30, 1989. 9:00 AM
06/21/1989Motion for Extension of Time filedREAL PARTIES (MURRYS)
06/20/1989Request made for reply to proceedingREPLY BY 6-27-89, CONTACT MR. REED
06/09/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
06/09/1989No description available.
06/09/1989Petition for writ received
06/09/1989Statement of Facts received2 VOLUMES
06/09/1989Transcript received3 VOLUMES
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/03/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THREE M. PROPERTIESRespondentMr. Albert A. 'Beto' Munoz II
MURRY, JAMES G.RespondentMr. Albert A. 'Beto' Munoz II
ULTREX, INC.RelatorMr. W. Wendell Hall
MURRY, ROY P.RespondentMr. Albert A. 'Beto' Munoz II
DORE EXPLORATION, INC.RelatorMr. W. Wendell Hall
Court of Appeals Information:
04-89-00166-CV
In Part Granted/Denied
773 SW2d 662, 05-31-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
229th District Court
Starr
Honorable Fernando G. Mancias
7374