judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00146-CV
12-89-00146-CV
06/09/1989
Divorce
Mosier, John Larry
Mosier, Sharon Dale
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
01/10/1991
01/08/1991No Description Available.
10/05/1990Mandate Issued
09/20/1990Record returned.
09/06/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/20/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
02/15/1990Disposition of MotionOverruled
02/15/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/31/1990No Description Available.
01/31/1990Response to Motion Filed
12/28/1989Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989
12/22/1989Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/20/1989No Description Available.
11/28/1989No Description Available.
11/22/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/22/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/14/1989No Description Available.
10/11/1989motion for rehearing filed
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/26/1989No Description Available.
09/26/1989No Description Available.Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
09/26/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/26/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Submission
09/26/1989Submitted
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989Response to Motion Filed
09/06/1989
09/06/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Response to Motion Filed
08/09/1989No Description Available.
08/07/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/07/1989Order Entered
08/02/1989affidavit filed
07/11/1989No Description Available.
06/30/1989Response to Motion Filed
06/20/1989
06/20/1989Letter from the Court
06/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/20/1989motion for extension of time to file sfacts
06/20/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
06/09/1989No Description Available.
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/25/1989Surety Bond Filed
02/27/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mosier, John L.AppellantMr. Charles Hosack
Mosier, Sharon DaleAppelleeMr. Bob Whitehurst
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
87-1107-F