judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TURNER, DAVID FRANKLIN UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0115
Short Caption:TURNER, DAVID FRANKLIN UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead:80-CM-0115Consolidated: 80-CM-0165
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5572-79Filed Date:02/27/1980

Opening Event Date:02/27/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/15/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/09/1980
Argued/Submitted:02/22/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TURNER, DAVID FRANKLIN UNITED STATES
02/27/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1980FiledRecord Completed
09/09/1980FiledBriefing Completed
02/22/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition