judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYAN KEITH GLOVER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0074)
Case Number:S-07-0074Case Docketed On:04/02/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BRYAN KEITH GLOVER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRYAN KEITH GLOVER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryan Keith GloverDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 169
Citation:169 P.3d 553 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/21/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/30/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/25/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/13/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/13/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/16/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/14/07 by Marilyn Jensen.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal