judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00526-CV
14-89-00526-CV
06/09/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Diamond M Company, Et Al
Dickerson, Charles A., Judge, 240th District Court, Ft. Bend
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/29/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
06/29/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
06/15/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
06/12/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/09/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
06/09/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorMary C. Thompson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorRoss Citti
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. G. Robert Friedman
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
60,621