Case Information: 35113 | |||
Short Caption: | WADE (ALLEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR88P782 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/09/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/09/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 99-11077 | |
11/12/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 7, 1999. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. | 99-11186 | |
12/08/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-12319 | |
12/14/1999 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on December 7, 1999, appointing Karla Butko as counsel for appellant. | 99-12589 | |
12/20/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-12936 | |
03/01/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-03205 | |
03/28/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-04922 | |
03/28/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/06/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2000. | 00-04922 |