Case: 14-89-00524-CV
14-89-00524-CV
06/09/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Clark, David J.
Pruitt, J. Albert Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/12/1990 | Case stored | | |
02/26/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/26/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/26/1990 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
01/11/1990 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
01/11/1990 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
12/28/1989 | Post submission brief FILED - ANT,APE | | |
12/28/1989 | Submitted | | |
12/28/1989 | Submission | | |
12/28/1989 | Submitted | | |
12/20/1989 | Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | DENIED | |
12/15/1989 | Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
12/04/1989 | Submission | | |
10/27/1989 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/27/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/27/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/12/1989 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/27/1989 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/31/1989 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/21/1989 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/17/1989 | Motion to strike DISPOSED - ANT, APE, STA | DENIED | |
08/04/1989 | Motion to Strike FILED - ANT, APE, STA | | |
08/03/1989 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/03/1989 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
07/25/1989 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
07/25/1989 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/09/1989 | Transcript FILED | | |
06/09/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/10/1989 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Hon. Susan McAuliffe |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Larry J. Doherty |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Karen A. Lerner |
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court
Harris
88-56721