judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00201-CV
07-89-00201-CV
06/09/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Princess Three Corporation
Harper, Doug
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1990Mandate Issued
04/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/06/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/22/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/06/1990Submitted
03/06/1990Submission
02/09/1990Submission
08/03/1989Case ready to be set
08/03/1989Brief Filed
07/11/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.Overruled
07/10/1989Brief Filed
07/07/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/12/1989Do not use
06/09/1989Do not use
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
84th District Court
Ochiltree
7844