Case: 99-1160
99-1160
11/18/1999
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE CONWELL CORPORATION, LISA MOTOR LINES, INC., and MIDDLETON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/18/1999 | Appendix Filed | Relator | Appendix to petition for writ of mandamus. | |
11/18/1999 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/10/2000 | Case Stored | 32-E-1 | | |
12/09/1999 | Amended Motion Disposed | Overruled | amended motion for emergency relief overruled. | |
12/09/1999 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | The court withdraws its request for response issued December 2, 1999. | |
12/06/1999 | Amendment to Motion filed | amended motion for emergency relief on behalf of Conwell Corporation, Lisa Motor Lines, Inc., et al. | | |
12/06/1999 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | mail sent to alt address for Mr. McCutchen returned as no such number. No oth address known. | | |
12/02/1999 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due Friday, 12/17/99; NO FILING FEE. | | |
11/29/1999 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | notice to Mr. McCutchen (pro se) returned no such address. Remailed to alt address. | | |
11/24/1999 | Letter Filed | informing the Court that the 5th COA ddenied relators' motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc in this case. Order attached. | | |
11/18/1999 | Motion for temporary relief | "Motion for Emergency Relief" | | |
11/18/1999 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Overruled | Motion for Emergency Relief overruled. Mandamus still pending. | |
11/18/1999 | Appendix Filed | Appendix to petition for writ of mandamus. | | |
11/18/1999 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 32-E-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BELLMORE, ANNETTE | Respondent | Ms. Terri J. Meador |
CONWELL CORPORATION | Relator | Mr. Gerard T. Fazio |
FROZEN FOOD EXPRESS INDUSTRIES | Other interested party | Mr. Gerard T. Fazio |
FFE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, I | Other interested party | Mr. Gerard T. Fazio |
MIDDLETON TRANSPORTATION COMPA | Relator | Mr. Gerard T. Fazio |
MCCUTCHEN, JOSEPH WILLIAM | Other interested party | Mr. Joseph William McCutchen |
FFE INDUSTRIES, INC. (F/K/A) | Other interested party | Mr. Gerard T. Fazio |
LISA MOTOR LINES, INC. | Relator | Ms. Tracy Lynn Stoker |
FROZEN FOOD EXPRESS, INC. | Other interested party | Ms. Tracy Lynn Stoker |
BELLMORE, GREGORY STEPHEN | Respondent | Mr. Robert Michael Meador |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-99-01219-CV
Denied and Vacated
RULE 47.7, 11-04-99
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable CAROLYN WRIGHT
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
97-04185-C