Case Heading (S-12-0232) | |||||
Case Number: | S-12-0232 | Case Docketed On: | 10/30/2012 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | CARLA STALCUP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | CARLA STALCUP, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Carla Stalcup | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Gregory A. Phillips David L. Delicath Theodore R. Racines Jeffrey Scott Pope |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2013 WY 114 |
Citation: | 311 P.3d 104 (Wyo. 2013). |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/30/2012 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/30/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/30/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/30/2012 | Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Davis is recused | Notice-Internal | Recusal memo | Final | |
12/14/2012 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
12/17/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/17/2012 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
01/31/2013 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
02/01/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/20/2013 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
03/21/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/09/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/12/2013 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
04/17/2013 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential Folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/17/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
04/17/2013 | Order - Assignment of judge | Order | Assignment of judge/justice | Final | |
04/17/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Kirk A. Morgan obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
05/01/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jeffrey Pope obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
05/21/2013 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and District Judge Sanderson (Kirk A. Morgan obo Appellant; Jeffrey S. Pope obo Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
09/27/2013 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court. Justice Hill delivers opinion concurring in part and dissenting inpart, with whom Justice Burke joins. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
10/01/2013 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - opinion signed for by agent of warden on 9/30/2013 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
10/15/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
10/15/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
10/15/2013 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
10/15/2013 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
10/21/2013 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 10/18/2013 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |