judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00527-CR
14-89-00527-CR
06/09/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Prosper, Robert Earl
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/27/1991Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
08/21/1990Case stored
08/10/1990Mandate Issued
08/10/1990Mandate Issued
07/26/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
06/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
04/30/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/24/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/13/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
03/29/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/29/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/07/1990Submitted
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
02/09/1990Submission
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
09/28/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/30/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/31/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/17/1989Transcript FILED
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/07/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
05/11/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/02/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJames B. Hicks
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn Paul Rickerson
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Grimes
11,742
99 years in TDC