judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00683-CR
05-89-00683-CR
06/09/1989
Robbery
White, Jr., Gregory James
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1997Motion to Withdraw Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/02/1997Motion to Withdraw Record
07/20/1990Mandate Issued
07/20/1990Mandate Issued
04/09/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
03/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/05/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/18/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
12/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/31/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/30/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/26/1989Transcript Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/01/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
06/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F89-96383-VJ
70 yrs TDC