judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00698-CV
05-89-00698-CV
06/09/1989
Contract
Bernal, Sam - d/b/a Sam Bernal Trucking Co. & Fulvio de Sant
Daniel Macias
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/17/1997Record RetentionDestroy
10/31/1989Mandate Issued
10/31/1989Mandate Issued
08/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
08/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
07/24/1989Letter Sent by the Court
06/09/1989Transcript Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/16/1989Affidavit Filed
02/16/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
CC87-1939-D