judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00692-CR
05-89-00692-CR
06/09/1989
Other Drug Sale
Haynes, Vincent Duane
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/1990Mandate Issued
07/26/1990Mandate Issued
05/29/1990Record RetentionDestroy
05/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
04/09/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
03/12/1990MattConv
01/02/1990Brief Filed
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Case ready to be set
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Brief Filed
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/23/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/21/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/10/1989Transcript Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/12/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/26/1990Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable g Andrews
F89-77879-QU
16 yrs TDC & $1,000 Fine