judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00528-CR
14-89-00528-CR
06/09/1989
Assault & battery
Coghlan, David Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/22/1990Waiver of remaining time to file briefState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/23/1990Case stored
10/16/1990Mandate Issued
10/16/1990Mandate Issued
10/01/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/14/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/29/1990Submitted
08/29/1990Submission
08/29/1990Submitted
05/10/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/07/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/15/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/06/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/01/1990Order Entered
01/22/1990Case ready to be set
01/22/1990Waiver of remaining time to file brief
01/22/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/05/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/04/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
12/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/02/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/28/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
09/28/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1989Date of Sentence
06/02/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/02/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantBen G. Levy
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
516,227
13 years TDC