judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00198-CV
07-89-00198-CV
06/09/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Owens, In the Interest of Ashley Renae, a child
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/05/1991Mandate Issued
12/19/1990Opinion issuedOverruled
11/28/1990Do not use
11/05/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
10/01/1990Submitted
10/01/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
10/01/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submission
09/13/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
08/29/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
08/18/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/27/1989Brief Filed
07/03/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
06/09/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barbara Beasley And MelvinAppelleeJack Stoffregen
A. L. (Lane)AppellantDeniece Jones, Ph.D.
Trial Court Information
46th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Leslie Thomas
17,818