judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00386-CR
07-96-00386-CR
11/06/1996
Burglary
Flores, Jr., Johnny G.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/10/1997Mandate Issued
07/25/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1997Submitted
07/25/1997Submission
06/23/1997Do not use
06/23/1997Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
06/13/1997Brief Filed
06/13/1997Case ready to be set
06/10/1997Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
05/19/1997Brief Filed
04/25/1997Do not use
02/28/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
02/27/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/26/1997Do not use
11/06/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Flores, Jr., Johnny G.Criminal - AppellantSara F. Moore
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael West
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William Shaver
95-421,424
16 Yrs - TDCJ; $2500 fine