judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-72,569
AP-72,569
11/06/1996
Appeal Case Type
VALDEZ, EX PARTE FRANCISCO MORENO, JR. AKA FRANK MORENO VALDEZ JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/12/2002CASE STORED
07/31/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
07/31/1998MANDATE ISSD
07/15/1998OPINION ISSDDismissed
07/15/1998OPINION ISSDDismissed
04/29/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
04/29/1998REINSTATED HC
04/29/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
04/29/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
04/29/1998REINSTATED & SUBM
04/29/1998SUPP CR FILED
02/27/1998EXT FF/CL DISPGranted
02/19/1998EXT FF/CL FILED
04/25/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
04/25/1997MANDATE ISSD
04/09/1997OPINION ISSDHC Remanded to trial court.
04/09/1997OPINION ISSDHC Remanded to trial court.
11/20/1996SUBMITTED
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
11/06/1996WRIT FILED
11/06/1996SET FOR SUBMIS
11/06/1996WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/12/2002STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
VALDEZ, EX PARTE FRANCISCO MORApplicantFrank Moreno Valdez
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable DENISE COLLINS
227340-C