judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOGAN VS. DIRECTOR

Case Information: 33489
Short Caption:HOGAN VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P0150Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Agosti, YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00423
12/17/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. (Clifton J.Young trial counsel.)
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/08/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-00110
01/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-00290
01/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On January 15, 1999, counsel filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The dealines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. 99-00570
01/28/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. (hand delivered 01/28/99). 99-00629
03/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 28, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a response to this court's order of January 8, 1999. As to the portion of the appeal that relates to the district court's order of September 25, 1998, counsel makes ono showing that the notice of appeal is timely. We order that this portion of the appeal is dismissed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order. Briefing shall then proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. fn1 The Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from the decision of this matter. 99-01714
04/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 99-02505
05/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On April 5, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Chief Justice, participated in the decision of this matter in place of the Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, who voluntarily recused herself]. SNP99A-RR/WM/NB 99-03839
05/12/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.