judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARON ANTOINE GARVIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1497
Short Caption:DARON ANTOINE GARVIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17016-07Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaron Antoine Garvin YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/13/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App R. 4 (b). (BY: ETW)
01/03/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's)
01/10/2011 On consideration of this court's 12/13/10 ORDER...the response thereto and it appearing that the NOA was first received in this court on 11/24/10 and it further appearing that NO TRANSCRIPT IS NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL, it is ORDERED that this court's OTSC IS HEREBY VACATED and the Clerks shall file the NOA, NPT to 11/24/10. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court by the Clerk of the Superior Court of the record index and record copies in accordance w/DC APP. R. 11(b)(3)(A). (BY: ETW)
01/20/2011RECORD INDEX
01/20/2011RECORD COPIES
01/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (memorandum opinion and order from Judge Cushenberry filed on 10/25/10 and 10/26/10)*****SEALED
01/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
03/14/2011APPENDIX
03/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 11/29/07 proc. w/CD
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 18, 2011
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Appellee's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (19-pgs/tape 2/8/08 proc.)w/cd
05/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/19/2011TMC - motion for extension of time to file brief - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
06/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED... It is ****MORE****
06/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is ****MORE*****
06/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (GLRDTE)
07/20/2011FiledMandate
07/21/2011LodgedMotion For Extension Of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration for 6 days. (Appellant)
07/22/2011LodgedMotion To Reconsider (Appellant)
02/05/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED MOTION TO RECONSIDER
02/10/2014FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE