judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-2,475-04
WR-2,475-04
11/06/1996
1107-HC
DIXON, WELDON CLERK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/22/1997ACTION TAKENHC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear
10/22/1997ACTION TAKENHC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear
10/06/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
09/03/1997SUPP RECD
09/03/1997SUPP RECD
01/22/1997ORDER ISSUEDHC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits
01/22/1997ORDER ISSUEDHC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits
12/16/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
11/06/1996HC WRIT RECEIVED
11/06/1996WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1997STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DIXON, WELDON CLARKApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
354th District Court
Hunt
01301-14,490