judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01745-CR
05-96-01745-CR
11/06/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
Ellis, Thomas Allen
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/20/1998Mandate Issued
05/20/1998Mandate Issued
03/23/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/23/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1998Submission
11/12/1997Brief Filed
10/02/1997Case ready to be set
10/02/1997MattConv
10/02/1997Case ready to be set
06/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/02/1997MattConv
05/08/1997Brief Filed
05/08/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/05/1997Brief Received
05/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/24/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
03/13/1997MattConv
02/11/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/30/1997MattConv
12/21/1996Record due
12/18/1996Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Notice Sent
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/29/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/09/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
08/23/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/20/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ellis, Thomas AllenCriminal - AppellantKaren Chilton Beverly
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 8
Dallas
MA95-22385-J
365 DYS JL TIME