judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1081
96-1081
11/06/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
LAWRENCE RYSAVY
THE HONORABLE JAMES D. SQUIER JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/07/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondenton behalf of Penelope Rysavy (motion incorporated with reply)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/07/1997Case Stored
11/08/1996Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion to expedite is granted
11/08/1996M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledMotion for leave to file petition for writ of mandamus is overruled
11/07/1996Motion to Expedite Filedon behalf of Penelope Rysavy (incorporated with the reply)
11/07/1996Notice requesting filing fee$10.00 fee for motion to expedite not paid
11/07/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamuson behalf of Penelope Rysavy (motion incorporated with reply)
11/06/1996Call receivedprevious to filing; attorney for real party intends to file reply upon receipt of notice of filing
11/06/1996Exhibits receivedAttached to petition
11/06/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
11/06/1996Petition for writ received
11/06/1996Statement of Facts receivedO + 2 copies entitled "Transcript of Proceedings"
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/06/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
RYSAVY, PENELOPERespondentMr. E. M. Schulze Jr.
Ms. Patrice McDonald
Mr. Kent W. Shriver
RYSAVEY, PENELOPERespondentMr. Grady W. James Jr.
RYSAVY, LAWRENCERelatorMr. Shawn R. Casey
Mr. James W. Woltz
RUNGE, BARBARA K.Other interested party Ms. Barbara K. Runge
Court of Appeals Information:
01-96-01256-CV
Improvident Grant
RULE 90, 11-04-96
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
312th District Court
Harris
Honorable James D. Squier
93-19485