judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00354-CV
04-81-00354-CV
10/20/1981
Divorce
Morales, Rita
Morales, Jose F.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/10/1983Mandate Issued
05/10/1983Original Exhibits Returned
05/10/1983Mandate Issued
03/16/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submitted
12/23/1982Case ready to be set
12/23/1982Case ready to be set
04/06/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/01/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/30/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/19/1982Brief Filed
03/11/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/11/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/17/1982Brief Filed
02/08/1982Submission
02/05/1982No Description Available.
02/05/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
01/19/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
01/18/1982No Description Available.
01/18/1982Exhibits Filed
01/10/1982No Description Available.
10/20/1981No Description Available.
10/20/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/13/1981Appeal Bond Filed
10/12/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/10/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Richard Woods
80-CI-7950