judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1077
96-1077
11/06/1996
application for writ of error granted by Court
MONTGOMERY COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT f/d/b/a MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL
VALARIE BROWN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1998Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Durwood D. Crawford, 1601 Elm Street, Suite 3300, Dallas, Texas 75201 214/969-5454
02/11/1998Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)from Bryan P. Neal (for Neiman Marcus Group, again) additional cites
11/19/1997Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)with additional cites, on behalf of the Neiman Marcus Group, by Bryan P. Neal, 1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3300, Dallas, Texas 75201-4693 214/969-1700
11/19/1997Post submission brief filedPetitioner
05/27/1997Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefRespondentResponse to amicus of Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.
04/14/1997Post submission brief filedPetitioner
04/03/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)On behalf of Exxon Corporation by Mark Schwartz & Anne Bruckner 1301 McKinney Street, Suite 3300, Houston Tx (713)951-9400
03/19/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of the Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., by Stephen F. Fink & Bryan P. Neal 1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3300, Dallas, TX 75201 214/969-1700
03/18/1997Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)On behalf of Exxon U.S.A. They will be filing an amicus curiae brief within 30 days. By Mark Schwartz @ 1301 McKinney, Suite 3300 Houston(713)951-9400
02/25/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Texas Employment Law Council, by W. Carl Jordan, 2827 First City Tower, 1001 Fannin, Houston, TX 77002 713/758-2258
11/21/1996Reply to ResponseRespondenton behalf of Valarie Brown
11/06/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/29/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
04/29/1998Mandate issued965 SW2d 501
04/28/1998list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksOrig. ONLY of Amc. Ltr. (03/18/98), Pet's Post-Sub Br., Amc. Br. (03/19/97), and Additional Cites (19/03/97) available when separated
03/30/1998Amicus Curiae Letter Receivedon behalf of Durwood D. Crawford, 1601 Elm Street, Suite 3300, Dallas, Texas 75201 214/969-5454
03/13/1998Concurring Opinion issued.concurring opinion by Justice Gonzalez
03/13/1998Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordjudgment issued
03/13/1998Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedCA judgment is reversed & judgment rendered in favor of petitioner. Opinion by NLH w/TRP, CTE, RS, PRO, JAB, GA. (J. Hankinson not sitting) 965 SW2d 501
03/13/1998Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedCA judgment is reversed & judgment rendered in favor of petitioner. Opinion by NLH w/TRP, CTE, RS, PRO, JAB, GA. (J. Hankinson not sitting) 965 SW2d 501
02/11/1998Amicus Curiae Letter Receivedfrom Bryan P. Neal (for Neiman Marcus Group, again) additional cites
01/22/1998Letter Filed
11/19/1997Amicus Curiae Letter Receivedwith additional cites, on behalf of the Neiman Marcus Group, by Bryan P. Neal, 1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3300, Dallas, Texas 75201-4693 214/969-1700
11/19/1997Post submission brief filed
10/03/1997Additional cites or additional authoritiesrec'd on behalf of Exxon by Mark Schwartz which addresses some of the issues raised in Exxon's amicus brief.
05/27/1997Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefResponse to amicus of Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.
04/14/1997Post submission brief filed
04/03/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOn behalf of Exxon Corporation by Mark Schwartz & Anne Bruckner 1301 McKinney Street, Suite 3300, Houston Tx (713)951-9400
03/19/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of the Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., by Stephen F. Fink & Bryan P. Neal 1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3300, Dallas, TX 75201 214/969-1700
03/18/1997Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedOn behalf of Exxon U.S.A. They will be filing an amicus curiae brief within 30 days. By Mark Schwartz @ 1301 McKinney, Suite 3300 Houston(713)951-9400
02/26/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
02/26/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
02/26/1997Oral argument argued for petitioner by Timothy D. Riley & Terri S. Harris for respondent by Laurence W. Watts
02/25/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Texas Employment Law Council, by W. Carl Jordan, 2827 First City Tower, 1001 Fannin, Houston, TX 77002 713/758-2258
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
01/31/1997Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20 minutes to argue
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGranted on Pts. 1 & 2
01/31/1997Notice from Counsel of a change in addressNotice of new address from Riley & Harris
01/31/1997Set for Submissionto be argued 26 February, 1997, at 9:00 a.m.
01/31/1997Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
11/26/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/21/1996Reply to Responseon behalf of Valarie Brown
11/06/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/29/1998Case StoredCase stored.30D2
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITALPetitionerMs. Terri S. Harris
BROWN, VALARIERespondentMr. Aaron J. Bennett
Mr. Carleton C. Casteel
Mr. Laurence W. Watts
MONTGOMERY COUNTY HOSPITALPetitionerMr. Timothy D. Riley
Court of Appeals Information:
09-95-00020-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Rem'd
929 SW2d 577, 08-29-96
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable RON CARR
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Allen L. Stilley
92-10-03662 CV