judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVIS (JAMES M.) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33488
Short Caption:DAVIS (JAMES M.) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5002Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00422
01/07/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jeffrey Morrison shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00083
03/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Fast track statement and appendix due or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned: 10 days. 99-01828
05/13/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Counsel for appellant shall personally pay the sum of $100 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment within 20 days. Further, counsel shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days. 99-03922
08/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Morrison has again failed to respond to our order. He has not paid the previous sanction, nor has he filed a fast track statement. Failure to comply with this court's orders and NRAP 3C warrants additional sanctions. Morrison shall personally pay the sum of $250.00 to the Supreme Court Library, fn1[additionally, we note that the $100.00 Morrison was previously sanctioned is still unpaid and due] and shall provide proof of such payment to the clerk of this court within 15 days of the date of this order. Morrison shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. 99-07410
10/13/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Morrison has again failed to respond to our order and has not paid the previous sanction, nor has he filed a fast track statement. Failure to comply with this court's orders and NRAP 3C warrants additional sanctions in the sum of $500.00. fn1[Additionally, we note that the $350.00 Morrison was previously sanctioned is still unpaid and due]. Morrison shall personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library, and provide proof of such payment to the clerk of this court within 15 days from the date of this order. Morrison shall, within 10 days of this order, show cause why he should not be held in contempt of this court, referred to the State Bar for investigation and imposition of appropriate discipline, and sanctioned further for his failure to comply with this court's orders. Morrison shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix in this appeal within 10 days of this order. 99-09911
10/25/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10468
10/25/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10469
11/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11079
11/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-11080
11/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Presentence Report--Confidential. 99-11081
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this case to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction to conform to the sentence orally pronounced by the court." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11501
11/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. To date, Morrison has not responded to our order to show cause. The $850.00 Morrison was previously sanctioned is still unpaid and due. Based on his repeated faillure to comply with this court's orders, Morrison is in contempt of this court. We further conclude that Morrison's continued failure to comply with this court's orders warrants additional sanctions in the sum of $1000.00. Morrison shall personally pay the sum of $1000.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library, and shall provide proof of such payment to the clerk of this court within 15 days of the date of this order. If Morrison fails to comply with this order, further sanctions will be imposed. We refer this matter to the Northern Nevada Disciplinary Board of the State Bar of Nevada for investigation and imposition of appropriate discipline based on Morrison's conduct in this matter. (Copy of order mailed to Morrison by regular and certified mail. Copy of order mailed to the State Bar in Reno and Las Vegas). 99-11573
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12632
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 1999. 99-12632
02/27/2003Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Order Directing Attorney Jeffrey D. Morrison to Pay Sanctions or Appear and Show Cause why he should not be held in contempt of court. In each of these appeals, this court sanctioned attorney Jeffrey D. Morrison for failure to comply with this court's orders and rules of appellate procedure. Despite the fact that the sanctions are long overdue, Morrison has failed to pay the sanctions, and he has not otherwise communicated with this court regarding the sanctions. Docket No. 33488: To date, the sanctions imposed in this appeal, in the total amount of $1,850.00, remain overdue and unpaid. Docket No. 34537: To date the sanction of $100 remains unpaid and overdue. Docket No. 37627: To date, the sanction of $500 remains unpaid and overdue, and Morrison has not otherwise responded to this court's order to show cause. Morrison's conduct in these matters is unacceptable. He shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment to the Supreme Court Law Library of the overdue sanctions, in the total amount of $2,450.00, plus an additional sanction payable to the Supreme Court Law Library of $1,000.00, or personally appear before this court and show cause why he should not be held in contempt of this court, and subjected to an appropriate punishment including, but not limited to, the possibility of confinement, immediate suspension from the practice of law, and an order of this court prohibiting Morrison from accepting clients charged with criminal offenses and the appointment by the court as counsel for indigent criminal defendants and also prohibiting him from appearing as counsel of record in this court. Docket Nos. 33488/34537/37627 not consolidated. 03-03228
03/21/2003Notice/IncomingReceived Proof of Payment of Sanction. Payment of sanctions on 3/19/03 in the amount of $3,450.00 from Jeffrey D. Morrison - check no. 5063 (per Law Library - see copy of order in correspondence files). Nos. 33488/34537/37627 - cases not consolidated.