judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, A FOX COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation, and RODNEY W. FOX, d/b/a FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, A FOX COMPANY v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

Case Heading (S-09-0027)
Case Number:S-09-0027Case Docketed On:02/03/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, A FOX COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation, and RODNEY W. FOX, d/b/a FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, A FOX COMPANY v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Full Title:FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, A FOX COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation, and RODNEY W. FOX, d/b/a FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, A FOX COMPANY, Appellants (Defendants), v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Appellee (Plaintiff)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFibertection Corporation, A Fox CompanyKenneth S. Cohen
AppellantRodney W. FoxKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeHoneywell International, Inc.Joseph F. Moore Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/13/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/19/2009Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Keith G. Kautz assigned to act in this matter for Chief Justice Voigt.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/26/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kenneth S. Cohen for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joseph Moore for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record Defendants' Additional Designation of RecordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/05/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Attachments and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/10/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
06/10/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
06/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's unopposed motion to continue oral argument set for June 17, 2009.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joseph F. Moore for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/30/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
08/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - motion to dismiss appeal. Contacted counsel for appellee re possible cost issues.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/04/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/10/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/7/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal