judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1078
96-1078
11/06/1996
Granted application that originated as 130(d) mo.
VINCENT A. BROWN
BANK OF GALVESTON NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/30/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/13/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/23/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
04/23/1998Mandate issuedNo Rehearing Filed 963 SW2d 511
03/06/1998Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling granted03-23-98
03/03/1998Addendum to brief receivedCert. of Conference (Faxed)
03/02/1998Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
03/02/1998Notice requesting filing fee$10.00 fee for m/e/t not paid letter sent to Maurice Bresenhan, Jr.
03/02/1998Phone call from Clerk's OfficeCalled Atty M. Bresenhan re: Cert. of Conference; Will comply via Fax ASAP
02/13/1998Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordjudgment issued
02/13/1998Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedOPINION OF THE COURT BY RS. 963 SW2d 511
10/16/1997Letter Filedin response to question from bench
10/07/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
10/07/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
10/07/1997Oral argument Argued for pet by Mr. Kenneth C. Kaye Argued for resp by Mr. Craig L. Stahl
06/06/1997Set for Submissionto be Argued 7 October, 1997
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/18/1997Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20 minutes to argue
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGranted on Pts. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 7 Submission date to be announced later
04/18/1997Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
01/02/1997Case forwarded to Court
12/30/1996Reply to Response
12/13/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/12/1996Notice requesting filing fee$5.00 fee for reply to 130(d) not included
11/12/1996Reply to M/E/T to file App Writ Erron behalf of Bank of Galveston
11/07/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 12-02-96
11/07/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 12-02-96
11/06/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/23/1998Case StoredCase stored.30C5 No Rehearing Filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BANK OF GALVESTON, NATIONAL ASRespondentMr. G. William Rider
Mr. Michael L. Wilson
Mr. Craig L. Stahl
BROWN, VINCENT A.PetitionerMr. Kenneth C. Kaye
Mr. Maurice Bresenhan Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
14-94-00596-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
930 SW2d 140, 07-18-96
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable LESLIE BROCK YATES
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
Honorable Henry G. Dalehite
88CV0293