judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1583-96
PD-1583-96
11/06/1996
PDR Case Type
BOYLES, THOMAS ATWOOD, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/26/1997REHEAR DISPDENIED
03/26/1997FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
03/26/1997REHEAR DISPDENIED
02/13/1997REHEAR FILED PDR
02/13/1997REHEAR FILED
01/29/1997PDR DISPRefused
01/29/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/09/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/06/1996PDR FILED
11/06/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BOYLES, THOMAS ATWOODJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John A. Haring
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-94-01727-CR
AFF 7-12-96
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 10
Dallas
Honorable MARSHALL GANDY
MB93-51995-L