judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1082
96-1082
11/06/1996
App Writ of Error
JEAN TONEY and LISA SUTHERLAND
GRAYSON COUNTY TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/22/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/06/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/02/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
02/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
11/26/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/22/1996Reply to Response
11/06/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/02/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F1 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SUTHERLAND, LISAPetitionerMs. Jennifer S. Stoddard
TONEY, JEANPetitionerMs. Janice K. Smith
Mr. James Donald Blume
GRAYSON COUNTY, TEXASRespondentMr. James C. Tidwell
Court of Appeals Information:
05-95-00347-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 08-27-96
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOHN OVARD
Trial Court Information
59th District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd W. Perkins
93-1771