judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01361-CV
14-96-01361-CV
11/06/1996
Mandamus/prohibition
WARNER G. "BUCK" MARTIN and IRVING SHUMAN
THE HONORABLE BRADY ELLIOTT, Judge 268th District Court, Fort Bend County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/03/1996Case stored
11/27/1996Opinion issuedDENIED
11/27/1996Opinion issuedDENIED
11/26/1996Submitted
11/26/1996Submission
11/26/1996Submitted
11/20/1996Reply Brief Filed
11/14/1996Respondent's Brief Due
11/14/1996Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
11/07/1996Court's request for a response
11/06/1996Exhibits received
11/06/1996Exhibits received
11/06/1996Motion to stay trial court proceeding FILED
11/06/1996Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
11/06/1996Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
IN INTEREST, REAL PARTIESRespondentCraig L. Weinstock
James E. Essig
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 268th District Court
WARNER G. "BUCK" MARTIN AND IRRelatorKenneth R. Wynne
Mark Maney
Michael James Collins
Rodney K. Caldwell
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
95,556