judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1585-96
PD-1585-96
11/06/1996
PDR Case Type
BRYANT, ANTHONY LASHELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1997FINAL DISPRefused
05/14/1997PDR DISPRefused
05/14/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/09/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/06/1996PDR FILED
11/06/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/09/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BRYANT, ANTHONY LASHELLApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Robert P. Abbott
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-92-01409-CR
REF & AFF 9-30-96
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
204th District Court
Dallas
Honorable RICHARD MAYS
F-9139256-TQ