judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00552-CV
13-96-00552-CV
11/06/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Norwest Mortgage, Inc.
Jose B. Salinas and Victoria B. Salinas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/10/2003Exhibits returned
12/08/2000Document Received
12/08/2000Exhibits Checked Out
11/29/2000Mandate Issued
11/03/2000Record returned to Court.
08/25/2000Petition For Review Disposed by Sup CtMotion or Writ Denied
12/07/1999Letter sent
12/01/1999Record Sent
11/19/1999Cite for opinions
11/08/1999express fee paid
11/05/1999request for documents
11/05/1999Notice was filed
08/26/1999copy of petition for review
08/24/1999Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
08/18/1999EXT FOR REVIEW DISP BY SUP CTMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1999ext for pet for review with Sup Ct
07/01/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/1998Letter sent
02/19/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/17/1998Post submission brief filed
02/05/1998Submitted
02/05/1998Filing Fee Paid
02/05/1998Miscellaneous Motion
02/05/1998Submission
02/04/1998Supplemental citation
01/30/1998Letter sent
01/05/1998Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/05/1998Submission
06/30/1997Reply Brief Filed
06/26/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed
06/19/1997Mo ext. of time to file REPLY BRIEF DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/1997Mo -ext of time to file REPLY BRIEF
05/15/1997Brief Filed
05/15/1997Oral argument requested
05/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/29/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/10/1997Miscellaneous Motion
04/10/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/26/1997Appearance of Counsel
03/26/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/06/1997Case ready to be set
03/06/1997Oral argument requested
03/06/1997Brief Filed
02/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/23/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/23/1997Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
12/31/1996Supplemental transcript filed
12/31/1996Filing Fee Paid
12/31/1996Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
12/31/1996Supplemental transcript recieved
12/12/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/02/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1996Statement Filed
11/13/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/06/1996Exhibits Filed
11/06/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/06/1996Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Exhibits received
11/06/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/06/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/06/1996Transcript Received
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Norwest Mortgage, Inc.AppellantHon. Audrey Mullert Vicknair
Hon. Roberta Dohse
Harvey Ferguson Jr.
Paul W. Nye
Salinas, Jose B. And VIctoriaAppelleeLarry G. Hyden
Hon. William R. Edwards III
Hon. John Blaise Gsanger
Hon. J. Mitchell Clark
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Robert Blackmon
93-714-B